Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Maria Giuseppe Andrea Luigi Solinas

Deceased

Bishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1740³BornBannari
30 Nov 176424.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 180261.8SelectedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
17 Jan 180362.2ConfirmedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
17 Apr 180362.4Ordained BishopBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
17 Jul 181776.7DiedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alberto Maria Giuseppe Andrea Luigi Solinas:
Bishop Alberto Maria Giuseppe Andrea Luigi Solinas (born , died ) Bishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori)

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013