Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Guillaume) Vicedomino Cardinal de Vicedominis

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1210¹Born
22 Jul 125747.5AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
3 Jun 127363.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
3 Jun 127363.4Elevated to Cardinal
7 Jun 127565.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
6 Sep 127666.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for (Guillaume) Vicedomino de Vicedominis
(Guillaume) Vicedomino Cardinal de Vicedominis (born 1210, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza
Death PlaceViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Francesco, Church, Viterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Jun 1273
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 96
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast