Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Saad Sirop

Apostolic Visitor (Visitator)

Titular Bishop of Hirta

Titular See: (Apostolic Visitor for Caldeans Residing in Europe)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1972 BornBaghdad
13 Oct 200129.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 201340.7SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
11 Jan 201441.3ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
11 Jan 201441.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirta
24 Jan 201441.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirta
19 Nov 201644.2AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)

MicroData Summary for Saad Sirop
Bishop Saad Sirop (born ) Apostolic Visitor (Visitator)

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2014
  • ob: CB, 11 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 24 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,076

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Nov 2016