Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Uriel Górka

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1435¹Born
26 May 147944.4AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
22 Aug 147944.6Ordained BishopBishop of Poznań, Poland
21 Jan 149863.0DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Uriel Górka
Bishop Uriel Górka (born 1435, died ) Bishop of Poznań

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 219
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,379

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast