Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blas Serrate

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1651¹BornLa Almolda
21 Nov 170150.9AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
19 Feb 170251.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
13 Jul 171867.5DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Blas Serrate:
Bishop Blas Serrate (died ) Bishop of Tarazona

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,486
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 21, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013