Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Piña (Peña) y Hermosa

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Oct 1656SelectedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
18 Jun 1657ConfirmedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
7 Oct 1657Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
8 Dec 1658SelectedBishop of Málaga, Spain
31 Mar 1659ConfirmedBishop of Málaga, Spain
11 Aug 1664AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
19 Jul 1667DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Piña (Peña) y Hermosa
Bishop Antonio Piña (Peña) y Hermosa (died ) Bishop of Jaén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgos, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Prado, Convent, Valladolid, Diocese of Valladolid
Death PlaceJaén, Diocese of Jaén

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 194, and Page 229
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 301
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 188, Number 1,182
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1657, Number 16
  • ob/loc: CB, 28 May 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,708

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast