Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Enríquez de Santo Tomás, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1631BornVélez-Málaga
26 Sep 166130.2AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
16 Apr 166230.8Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
15 Nov 166332.4SelectedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
28 Jan 166432.6ConfirmedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
15 Sep 166433.2AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
30 Jul 169261.1DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Enríquez de Santo Tomás:
Bishop Alfonso Enríquez de Santo Tomás O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,462
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 268, and Page 282
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 229
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 253
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 195, Number 1,222
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015