Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ulzurrun de Asanza y Civera

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1659³BornZaragoza
30 Jun 171455.3SelectedBishop of León, Spain
17 Sep 171455.5ConfirmedBishop of León, Spain
9 Dec 171455.8Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
17 Apr 171859.1DiedBishop of León, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Ulzurrun de Asanza y Civera:
Bishop José Ulzurrun de Asanza y Civera (born , died ) Bishop of León

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,489
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 31, Number 90
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015