Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakiv Suša, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹Born
1 Nov 162616.8ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1632²22.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
9 Nov 164939.8SelectedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
22 Feb 165242.1AppointedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
3 Oct 165242.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
4 Sep 168777.6DiedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakiv Suša
Bishop Jakiv Suša O.S.B.M. (born 1610, died ) Bishop of Chełm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinsk

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 302
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,209
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,739
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast