Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prokip Chmielowski (Chmeljovskyj)

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian)

Administrator of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian)

Note/Previous Titular See: Sambir


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹Born
1651²51.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
1651²51.0AppointedAdministrator of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
12 Mar 165151.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
6 May 1652³52.3SucceededBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
22 Feb 166464.1DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Prokip Chmielowski (Chmeljovskyj):
Bishop Prokip Chmielowski (Chmeljovskyj) (born 1600, died ) Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 263, and Page 272
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,738
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,986
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015