Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Bonaventura Secusio, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catania, Italy

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558¹Born
1593²35.0AppointedMinister General of Order of Observant Friars Minor
10 Mar 159941.1AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
14 Mar 159941.2Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
1600²42.0ResignedMinister General of Order of Observant Friars Minor
30 Apr 160143.3AppointedPatriarch (Personal Title) of Patti, Italy
17 Aug 160547.6AppointedPatriarch (Personal Title) of Messina, Italy
10 Jun 160951.4AppointedPatriarch (Personal Title) of Catania, Italy
Mar 1618³60.1DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Secusio (VIAF: 183283973)
Patriarch Bonaventura Secusio O.F.M. Obs. (born 1558, died Mar 1618) Bishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaltagirone
Ordained BishopS. François, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 162, and Page 239
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 141
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Mar 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast