Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Tolosa, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558²Born
2 Feb 158325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
30 Apr 160143.3AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
13 May 160143.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
30 May 160244.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
12 Jun 160648.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
16 Dec 161557.9AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
3 Oct 161860.7DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Tolosa
Archbishop Paolo Tolosa C.R. (born 1558, died ) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 332, and Page 120
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,961
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,601, Number 8
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 289
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast