Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Chébli (Scebli)

Deceased

Archbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1870Born
14 Jul 189726.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 190837.1AppointedArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
15 Feb 190837.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
30 May 191746.4DiedArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Pierre Chébli (Scebli)
Archbishop Pierre Chébli (Scebli) (born , died ) Archbishop of Beirut {Bairut}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDefoun

  • a priest for 19.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 85
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1908, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast