Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Sanz Grado

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1789BornMadriguera
7 Aug 184960.6SelectedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
7 Jan 185061.0ConfirmedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
28 Apr 185061.3Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
21 Jan 185162.0DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Salvador Sanz Grado:
Bishop Salvador Sanz Grado (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,660
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 491
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 158, Number 866

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013