Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Alcántara de la Santísima Trinidad, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

Titular Bishop of Areopolis


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jan 1728AppointedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India
28 Jan 1728AppointedTitular Bishop of Areopolis
19 Oct 1732Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Areopolis
3 Nov 1744DiedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India

MicroData Summary for Pedro Alcántara de la Santísima Trinidad:
Bishop Pedro Alcántara de la Santísima Trinidad O.C.D. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 51, Number 216
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015