Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Ruiz Camargo

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Aug 1613AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
1614²Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
23 May 1622AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
16 Feb 1632AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
3 Jan 1633DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Ruiz Camargo:
Bishop Jerónimo Ruiz Camargo (died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,159
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 164, and Page 142
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 151
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 131, Number 838

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015