Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Beltrán Guevara y Figueroa

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540²BornValencia del Ventoso
4 Dec 160666.9AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
8 Dec 160666.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
28 Nov 161171.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Badajoz, Spain
12 Jan 161575.0AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
22 May 162282.3DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Beltrán Guevara y Figueroa:
Archbishop Juan Beltrán Guevara y Figueroa (born 1540, died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 158, and Page 269
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 301
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 122, Number 775
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015