Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Hildebrand Roten

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1722³Born
20 Dec 174422.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
12 Jun 174523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
25 Sep 175230.5SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
18 Dec 175230.8ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
25 Feb 175330.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
19 Sep 176038.5DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Hildebrand Roten
Bishop Johann Hildebrand Roten (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRaron

  • a priest for 15.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 372
  • ob: CB, 28 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast