Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominico Rota, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹Born
7 Mar 159113.1ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
21 Aug 162850.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
27 Aug 162850.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
14 May 163052.3DiedTitular Bishop of Sidon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominico Rota (VIAF: 60176128)
Bishop Dominico Rota O. Carm. (born 1578, died ) Titular Bishop of Sidon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Crisogono, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 315
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 31
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,985

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018