Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Benedikt von Rost

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1696Born
25 Jun 172024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
13 Dec 172832.8SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
23 Mar 172933.0ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
9 Jun 172933.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
12 Nov 175458.7DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Benedikt von Rost (VIAF: 315523666)
Bishop Joseph Benedikt von Rost (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVils
Ordained BishopCathedral, Trento, Diocese of Trento, Italy
Death PlaceChur, Diocese of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson, Manitoba, Canada

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 178
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 21
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd/ob.loc: CB, 16 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast