Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Christoph Rösch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1577BornDillingen
1602²24.7Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
16 Jul 161235.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
16 Jul 161235.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
12 Oct 161235.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
30 Nov 163457.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg Christoph Rösch:
Bishop Georg Christoph Rösch (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 279
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,001
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015