Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jodok Wagenhauer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1622AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
23 May 1622AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
18 Sep 1622Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
19 Jan 1635DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Jodok Wagenhauer:
Bishop Jodok Wagenhauer (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015