Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel Rodríguez Castañón

Deceased

Bishop of Tuy, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1695³Born
4 May 173943.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
4 May 173943.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Uthina
21 Jun 173944.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uthina
20 Mar 175256.8AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
12 Jul 176974.1DiedBishop of Tuy, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Rodríguez Castañón
Bishop Juan Manuel Rodríguez Castañón (born , died ) Bishop of Tuy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLois

  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 421, and Page 428
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 451
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,523
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 58, Number 262
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,739, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast