Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Galindo

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1684BornJosa
20 Feb 172641.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
20 Feb 172641.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
1 May 172642.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
11 Apr 173652.1AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
11 Dec 175672.8DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Galindo:
Bishop Gregorio Galindo (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 43, Number 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015