Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Francisco Guillén

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1686BornUrdués de Lerda
30 Sep 173953.7AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
27 Dec 173954.0Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
15 Mar 175165.2AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
7 Apr 175771.2DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Guillén:
Archbishop Juan Francisco Guillén (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,494
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 59, Number 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013