Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel de Escobar y de la Carrera

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1699Born
24 Apr 175252.8AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
11 Jun 175252.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
27 Jul 175253.1DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel de Escobar y de la Carrera
Bishop Juan Manuel de Escobar y de la Carrera (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeón

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 70, Number 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast