Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Ricciulli

Deceased

Bishop of Belcastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornCosenza
5 Dec 161636.9AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
13 Dec 161636.9Ordained BishopBishop of Belcastro, Italy
7 Aug 1626³46.5DiedBishop of Belcastro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Ricciulli:
Bishop Girolamo Ricciulli (born 1580, died ) Bishop of Belcastro

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 61, Number 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015