Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Antonius de Ricci

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

Titular Bishop of Draso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1745Born
14 Apr 176722.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
20 Mar 176823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
20 Jul 180156.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
20 Jul 180156.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Draso
4 Oct 180156.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Draso
27 Jul 181873.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Johannes Antonius de Ricci
Bishop Johannes Antonius de Ricci (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrmin

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 179
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1801, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast