Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Reis

Deceased

Bishop of Zaku (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1898BornAraden
29 Jun 192324.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 195758.2AppointedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
12 May 195758.4Ordained BishopBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
15 Jul 196566.5DiedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Thomas Reis:
Bishop Thomas Reis (born , died ) Bishop of Zaku

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,380

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015