Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Daffis

Deceased

Bishop of Lombez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554¹Born
19 Jan 159440.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lombez, France
19 Jan 159440.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
10 Nov 159743.8SucceededBishop of Lombez, France
1 Feb 161460.0DiedBishop of Lombez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Daffis (VIAF: 288052346)
Bishop Jean Daffis (born 1554, died ) Bishop of Lombez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux
Death PlaceToulouse, Archdiocese of Toulouse

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,346
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 103, and Page 223
  • ~c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 227
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,594, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast