Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simone Rau e Requesens

Deceased

Bishop of Patti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1609BornPalermo
30 Apr 165747.7SelectedBishop of Patti, Italy
8 Jul 165848.9ConfirmedBishop of Patti, Italy
20 Sep 165950.1DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Simone Rau e Requesens
Bishop Simone Rau e Requesens (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 270
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 33
  • bp/bd/d: AT, 21 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Jun 2016