Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Narciso Queralt

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1691³BornSanta Coloma de Queralt
23 Jun 173847.3AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
19 Oct 173847.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
12 Jan 174351.9DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Narciso Queralt:
Bishop Narciso Queralt (born , died ) Bishop of Ávila

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 62
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 57, Number 252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014