Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltasar Bastero Lladó

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1687³Born
15 Dec 172841.0AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
1729²41.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
2 Mar 174557.2ResignedBishop of Gerona, Spain
175062.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Gerona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baltasar Bastero Lladó
Bishop Baltasar Bastero Lladó (born , died 1750) Bishop Emeritus of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona

  • a bishop for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 47, Number 193
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 60
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast