Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Copóns Copóns

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1679³BornVillafranca del Penedés
11 Sep 172646.9AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
1 Dec 172647.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
15 Dec 172849.2AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
19 Apr 175373.5DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Copóns Copóns:
Archbishop Pedro Copóns Copóns (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,070
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 209, and Page 369
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 44, Number 168
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015