Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Antonio Aymerich de Villamar

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1738BornCagliari
18 Dec 176224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cagliari, Italy
15 Sep 178850.2AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
9 Nov 178850.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
23 Jul 180668.0DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Antonio Aymerich de Villamar:
Bishop Michele Antonio Aymerich de Villamar (born , died ) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806, Page 115
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 429
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,705

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013