Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomasz Syrus (Toma) Polyanskyi (Polanski)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1796Born
1819²22.2Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
5 Sep 185962.8SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
23 Mar 186063.4ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
2 Dec 186064.1Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
1 Oct 186770.9ResignedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
11 Nov 186973.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomasz Syrus (Toma) Polyanskyi (Polanski) (VIAF: 313516567)
Bishop Tomasz Syrus (Toma) Polyanskyi (Polanski) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBartne

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB, 13 Feb 2015
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017