Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de la Torre Ayala

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Oct 1621AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
12 Feb 1622Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
7 Jan 1626AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
13 Jun 1638AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
11 Sep 1638DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan de la Torre Ayala
Bishop Juan de la Torre Ayala (died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgos

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,831
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 103, and Page 151
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 376
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 141, Number 900
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast