Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sisto Maria Pironti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sarno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1620BornNapoli
5 May 166645.9AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
9 May 166645.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sarno, Italy
12 Aug 167353.2DiedBishop of Sarno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sisto Maria Pironti:
Bishop Sisto Maria Pironti O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Sarno

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 306
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015