Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrogio Maria Piccolomini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1627¹Born
5 May 166639.3AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
9 May 166639.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
27 May 167548.4AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
1682²55.0DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Maria Piccolomini
Archbishop Ambrogio Maria Piccolomini O.S.B. (born 1627, died 1682) Archbishop of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 223
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 345
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast