Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustachio Locatelli, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Apr 1569AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
29 Apr 1569Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
14 Oct 1575DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eustachio Locatelli
Bishop Eustachio Locatelli O.P. (died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 15, Number 52
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1569, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast