Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mariano Cardinal Pierbenedetti

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1538¹Born
30 Jan 157739.0AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
20 Dec 158951.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 159052.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
5 Apr 159153.2ResignedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
7 Feb 160769.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
28 May 160870.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
21 Jan 161173.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Pierbenedetti
Mariano Cardinal Pierbenedetti (born 1538, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Presepe chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1589
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 53, and Page 237
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1577, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast