Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Beaucaire de Péguillon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Metz, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1514Born
16 Dec 155541.6AppointedBishop of Metz, France
4 Oct 155642.4Ordained BishopBishop of Metz, France
1568¹53.7ResignedBishop of Metz, France
14 Feb 159176.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Metz, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Beaucaire de Péguillon (VIAF: 37254431)
Bishop François de Beaucaire de Péguillon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrête, Château, Allier
Ordained BishopChurch, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,338
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,556, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast