Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Chisholm

Deceased

Bishop of Vaison


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Nov 1585AppointedBishop of Vaison, France
11 Nov 1585Ordained BishopBishop of Vaison, France
13 Dec 1629DiedBishop of Vaison, France

MicroData Summary for William Chisholm:
Bishop William Chisholm (died ) Bishop of Vaison

  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 327
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 24, Number 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013