Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Decio Cardinal Azzolini (Sr.)

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia

Cardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1549BornFermo
15 Nov 158536.4AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
18 Dec 158536.5Elevated to Cardinal
158636.5AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
15 Jan 158636.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
7 Oct 158738.3DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Decio Azzolini (Sr.):
Cardinal Decio Azzolini (Sr.) (born , died ) Bishop of Cervia

  • a cardinal for 1.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1585
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013