Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Peralta Barrionuevo y Rocha Benavídez, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1699BornLima, Peru
19 May 173839.1SelectedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
23 Jun 173839.2ConfirmedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
Nov 174041.5Ordained BishopBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
14 Jun 174647.1AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
17 Nov 174647.6DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for José de Peralta Barrionuevo y Rocha Benavídez:
Bishop José de Peralta Barrionuevo y Rocha Benavídez O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of La Paz

  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 16 Oct 2013