Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Fortunato Paternò

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Catania, Italy

Titular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1757Born
5 Apr 178325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Catania, Italy
17 Nov 182366.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Catania, Italy
17 Nov 182366.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
23 Nov 182366.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
8 Mar 183476.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Fortunato Paternò
Bishop Giovanni Fortunato Paternò (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatania

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,823, Number 44
  • fn/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast