Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés de Paredes y Armendáriz

Deceased

Bishop of Quito, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1675Born
18 Jun 173155.7AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
25 Jan 173458.3Ordained BishopBishop of Quito, Ecuador
3 Jul 174569.7DiedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Andrés de Paredes y Armendáriz
Bishop Andrés de Paredes y Armendáriz (born , died ) Bishop of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 351
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast