Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco José de Figueredo y Victoria

Deceased

Archbishop of Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1685¹BornPopayán
24 Sep 174055.7SelectedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
30 Jan 174156.0ConfirmedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
Jan 1742²57.0Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
18 Nov 175166.8SelectedArchbishop of Guatemala
24 Jan 175267.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Guatemala
24 Jun 176580.4DiedArchbishop of Guatemala

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco José de Figueredo y Victoria:
Archbishop Francisco José de Figueredo y Victoria (born 1685, died ) Archbishop of Guatemala

  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 231, and Page 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015