Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Antonio Palmero y Rallo

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1706³BornVillalobos
19 Jul 175649.5AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
7 May 177467.3DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Antonio Palmero y Rallo:
Bishop Manuel Antonio Palmero y Rallo (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 225
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 74, Number 365
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 18 Nov 2015