Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orlando (Rolando) Rovescala, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vaison, France

Titular Bishop of Antarados


Events

DateEventTitle
1475¹AppointedTitular Bishop of Antarados
4 Jun 1475Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antarados
17 Oct 1483AppointedBishop of Vaison, France
28 Feb 1485ResignedBishop of Vaison, France
28 Feb 1485AppointedTitular Bishop of Antarados

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Orlando (Rolando) Rovescala
Bishop Orlando (Rolando) Rovescala O.F.M. , Bishop Emeritus of Vaison

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRovescala
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 89, and Page 263
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1475, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 20 Nov 2018

Quantcast